Anderson, Jesse Coleman Benjamin (CPSO#: 97301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
2745 23 AVE SW
Calgary (Lakeview / Glendale / NL  T3E 7X7
Phone: 6479933677

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospital 425 Algonquin Blvd E Timmins ON P4N 1B5
Date Received: 15 Nov 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE COLEMAN BENJAMIN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Feb 2012 to 07 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2018