Anderson, Peter Robert (CPSO#: 92790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
Unit 1
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: (519) 833-9838
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: 905-878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. R. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anderson ( CPSO# 92790 )

Business Address:
East Wellington Family Health Team
Unit 1
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 833-9396

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ROBERT ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012