Andonov, Igor (CPSO#: 83938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Macedonian

Education:ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Bruce Grey Health Centre
21 McGivern Street, PO Box 1300
Walkerton ON
Kincardine ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: 519 370 2400 Ext. 2261
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Andonov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Andonov ( CPSO# 83938 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGOR ANDONOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDONOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Dec 2005 to 26 Feb 2006
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2006 to 26 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2007 to 26 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2008 to 26 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2009 to 26 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2010 to 26 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014