Andrews-Alexander, Amy Leann Elizabeth (CPSO#: 85083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: Andrews, Amy Leann Elizabeth (used until: 05 Apr 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychosocial Onc/Palliative Care
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6080
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1329 Golden Meadow Trail
Oakville ON  L6H 3H1
Canada
Phone: (647) 877-6463
Fax: (647) 776-7779
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Andrews-Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Andrews-Alexander ( CPSO# 85083 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY LEANN ELIZABETH ANDREWS-ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS-ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2009