Andronowski, Adam Kajetan (CPSO#: 80140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Andronowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015


Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Adam Kajetan
            Andronowski, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Andronowski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Andronowski has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.