Aneja, Ambika (CPSO#: 81287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Road Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9373
Fax: (416) 673-9374
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBIKA ANEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009