Angel, Jonathan Benjamin (CPSO#: 59625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room G 8
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8442
Fax: (613) 739-6866
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Angel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Angel ( CPSO# 59625 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Room G 8
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN BENJAMIN ANGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989