Angel, Michael Joshua (CPSO#: 75014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Avenue East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 647 551-6331
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber college blvd
Toronto ON  M9V1R8
Canada
Phone: 4167473500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 bathurst st
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

ATC
3560 Bathurst Street, Main Floor
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 784-3600
Fax: (416) 784-5600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherson Rd
Outpatient Clinics
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-8121
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Angel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Angel ( CPSO# 75014 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (647) 551-6331

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 784-3600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSHUA ANGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005