Angelini, Paola (CPSO#: 87153)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Turin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016