Angelski, Carla Lynn (CPSO#: 86322)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2010 to 05 May 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2010