Angelus, Theodor Miltos (CPSO#: 19466)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998