Anjum, Mahraz (CPSO#: 89066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Anjum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anjum ( CPSO# 89066 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHRAZ ANJUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANJUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012