Ankawi, Ghada Abdulrahman A (CPSO#: 94940)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Apr 2011 to 06 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2017