Anselm, Daniel Dominic (CPSO#: 97720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2019

Expiry Date:  03 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 07 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL DOMINIC ANSELM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ANSELM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ANSELM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANSELM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ANSELM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ANSELM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ANSELM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 03 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 09 Feb 2018
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2019 to 03 May 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2019