Antar, Ramy (CPSO#: 94378)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014