Anthes, Margaret Lyn (CPSO#: 63827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Cancer Care
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7211
Fax: (807) 684-5801
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret L. Anthes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anthes ( CPSO# 63827 )

Business Address:
Regional Cancer Care
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET LYN ANTHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992