Antolinez Uribe, Edgar (CPSO#: 80231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Wellington St North
Woodstock, ON
N4S 6P1
Woodstock ON  N4S 6P1
Phone: (519) 290-5000
Fax: (519) 290-0467
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Antolinez Uribe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Antolinez Uribe ( CPSO# 80231 )

Business Address:
17 Wellington Street North
Woodstock ON  N4S 6P1
Phone Number: (519) 290-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDGAR ANTOLINEZ URIBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTOLINEZ URIBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2009