Anton, Natalie Rita (CPSO#: 73151)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002