Antoniou, Maria (CPSO#: 67259)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011