Antunes, Paulo Rui Mendonca (CPSO#: 94581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre de Sante Communautaire
de l'Estrie
Unit 6
841 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3J7
Phone: (613) 937-2683
Fax: (613) 937-1729
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Paulo  Rui  Mendonca Antunes may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.