Antunes, Rui Largo (CPSO#: 71979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Mar 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Coimbra, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Hotel Dieu Site
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 2217
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Jan 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Jan 2007 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  September 18, 2003, the following Undertaking, as amended January 16,
            2007, from  Dr.  Rui Largo Antunes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario is imposed  as  a  term, condition and limitation on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Antunes:

                                 Undertaking by Dr. Rui Largo Antunes

                  1.    I agree that I am  restricted  from performing all medical practice
                        except as a surgical assistant with  a  surgeon  certified  by  the
                        Royal  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  or other
                        registration  requirements  acceptable to the College of Physicians
                        and  Surgeons of Ontario (the  College)  who  is  approved  by  the
                        College and is present at all times.
                  
                  2.    I agree  that  at  no  time  will I conduct any independent patient
                        care.
                  
                  3.    I agree that as a condition of  my certificate of registration, and
                        in order that compliance with conditions  1 and 2 can be monitored,
                        I am required to obtain a letter signed by  the Chief of Surgery at
                        every hospital at which I have worked in the  previous  six  months
                        confirming  that  I have been working only as a surgical assistant.
                        This letter must be  provided  to the College on January 1 and June
                        30 of every year until I cease to practise. 
                  
                  4.    I  agree  that  as  a further means  of  ensuring  compliance  with
                        conditions 1 and 2, I  will  execute and provide the College with a
                        consent to OHIP attached to my Undertaking as Schedule "A".
                  
                  5.    I acknowledge that this Undertaking is irrevocable, and acknowledge
                        that I have received independent  legal advice prior to signing the
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  6.    I  agree  that  this  Undertaking will  be  posted  on  the  public
                        register.
                  
                  7.    I  understand  that if the  Registrar  receives  information  which
                        indicates that I  have  failed to comply with this Undertaking, the
                        Registrar may suspend my  certificate  of  registration immediately
                        and  provide  me  with  14  days' notice that the  matter  will  be
                        reported to the Executive Committee. I may make written submissions
                        within  14 days. Under these circumstances  the  suspension  of  my
                        certificate of registration shall remain in place until the College
                        determines  that  my patients are no longer likely to be exposed to
                        harm or injury.
                  
                  8.    I acknowledge that  if  I  fail  to  comply  with the terms of this
                        Undertaking,  the  College  may seek a referral to  the  Discipline
                        Committee or a referral to the  Fitness  to  Practice Committee and
                        may  introduce  this Undertaking into evidence at  the  hearing  as
                        proof of its contents.