Apostle, Nicole Alexandra (CPSO#: 86014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Apostle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ALEXANDRA APOSTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APOSTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Mar 2007 to 08 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016