Appelby, Mark Evan (CPSO#: 72298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Regent Medical Clinic
Suite 102
2737 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 2E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-4500
Fax: (416) 398-4700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Park Medical Centre
2355 Keele St, U 13
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 244-4377
Fax: (416) 244-1004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Appelby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Appelby ( CPSO# 72298 )

Business Address:
Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 489-2106

Business Address:
Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 780-9986

Business Address:
Regent Medical Clinic
2737 Keele Street
Suite 102
North York ON  M3M 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 398-4500

Business Address:
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK EVAN APPELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000