Appleton, Christopher Thomas George (CPSO#: 95559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6319
Fax: (519) 646-6406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Thomas G. Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Appleton ( CPSO# 95559 )

Business Address:
Rheumatology Clinic
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2-163
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS GEORGE APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015