Apriasz, Izabela (CPSO#: 84981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: 1-807-223-8200
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

87 Spruce Street
Vermilion Bay ON  P0V 2V0
Canada
Phone: 1-807-227-2675
Fax: 807-227-2339
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Izabela Apriasz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Apriasz ( CPSO# 84981 )

Business Address:
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-8200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IZABELA APRIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRIASZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013