Apte, Nitin Mukund (CPSO#: 78867)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Feb 2003 to 26 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 27 Mar 2003 to 24 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2004