Aptowitzer, Iris Meira (CPSO#: 80302)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2006 to 30 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2006 to 30 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2011