Araghi, Golbarg (CPSO#: 79242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: Haj-Agha Mohsen Araghi, Golbarg (used until: 03 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 - 9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3G5
Phone: (905) 889-6317
Fax: (905) 889-8655
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Golbarg Araghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Araghi ( CPSO# 79242 )

Business Address:
9160 Bayview Avenue
Unit 103
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3G5
Phone Number: (905) 889-6317

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOLBARG ARAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004