Ararat, Alpay Timur (CPSO#: 84236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ararat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ararat ( CPSO# 84236 )
Dr. T. Hess ( CPSO# 88558 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
C2 - 2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: (416) 792-3043

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
302 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALPAY TIMUR ARARAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARARAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011