Arcand, Jennifer Louise (CPSO#: 92847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone: (613) 433-9152
Fax: (613) 433-9154
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer L. Arcand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Arcand ( CPSO# 92847 )

Business Address:
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone Number: (613) 433-9152

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LOUISE ARCAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012