Archer, Lori Anne (CPSO#: 94323)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2013 to 29 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 2013