Ardelean, Daniela Simona (CPSO#: 81368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G0W7
Phone: (519) 474-7007
Fax: (888) 920-5251
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.S. Ardelean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ardelean ( CPSO# 81368 )

Business Address:
1807 Wonderland Road North
Suite 201
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 433-4300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA SIMONA ARDELEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDELEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008