Ardeshiri, Farnaz (CPSO#: 82835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 597-1051
Fax: (416) 221-5044
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Ardeshiri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ardeshiri ( CPSO# 82835 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone Number: (905) 597-1051

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARNAZ ARDESHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARDESHIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007