Aref, Mohammed Hani M (CPSO#: 95064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Swedish Medical Center
550 17th ave, suite 500
Seattle WA  98101
United States
Phone: 2063202800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HANI M AREF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AREF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 06 Jul 2011
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017