Ariana, Anahita (CPSO#: 77842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stn Terminal
PO Box 5250
Vancouver, BC
V6B 5L5
Victoria BC  V8Y 2K6
Phone: 250-881-7276

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAHITA ARIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARIANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004