Arkilander, Adrianna (CPSO#: 77645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7030 Derry Rd
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrianna Arkilander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arkilander ( CPSO# 77645 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANNA ARKILANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARKILANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2005