Armani, Antonio Alvi (CPSO#: 55789)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Mar-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 7, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Armani has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.