Armour, Christine Marion (CPSO#: 77746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Genetics Clinic WC2
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2826
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Armour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 01 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARION ARMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008