Armstrong, Irene Eleanor (CPSO#: 72365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
8th Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 338-7993
Fax: (416) 338-7870
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE ELEANOR ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 02 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001