Armstrong, Kathleen Anne (CPSO#: 95685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  21 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Plastic Surgery
The Rotman/Stewart Building
Room 508
149 College Street, 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: (416) 978-8534
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANNE ARMSTRONG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ARMSTRONG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ARMSTRONG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ARMSTRONG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ARMSTRONG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ARMSTRONG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 21 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2019