Armstrong, Kathryn Genevieve Wall (CPSO#: 82527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KGW Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Armstrong ( CPSO# 82527 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Suite 102
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN GENEVIEVE WALL ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010