Armstrong, Sarah Alice (CPSO#: 91773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child & Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

860 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H8
Canada
Phone: 519-646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ALICE ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014