Arnaout, Amel (CPSO#: 74870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amel Arnaout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMEL ARNAOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNAOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006