Arno Clua, Ana Isabel (CPSO#: 94600)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Barcelona, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011