Arnold, Donald Mitchell (CPSO#: 73317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 3H50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28603
Fax: (905) 524-2983
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. DM Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arnold ( CPSO# 73317 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
3V50 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD MITCHELL ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 1999 to 02 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002