Arntfield, Robert Thomas (CPSO#: 81261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Room D2 521A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-6440
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arntfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arntfield ( CPSO# 81261 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Health Care
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm D2-521A
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMAS ARNTFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNTFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009