Aronnilakkara, Priya Prasad (CPSO#: 89900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Front Street W, Box 49
Unit C021D
Toronto ON  M5V 3K2
Phone: 416-599-9000
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA PRASAD ARONNILAKKARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONNILAKKARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 11 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 06 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008