Arora, Harpreet Singh (CPSO#: 85872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: S. and H. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 87714 )
Dr. H. Arora ( CPSO# 85872 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Harpreet  Singh  Arora  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Family
            Medicine, only.