Arora, Monil (CPSO#: 93002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Centre
2817, Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone: (613) 789-1011
Fax: 844-666-2491
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora ( CPSO# 93002 )
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 90515 )

Business Address:
Notre Dame Medical Centre
934 Notre Dame Street
Box 347
Russell ON  K0A 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 443-0444

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 789-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIL ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012