Arora, Nawaz Suneet (CPSO#: 80218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 309-0066
Fax: (519) 309-0068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nawaz Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arora ( CPSO# 80218 )

Business Address:
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 309-0066

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAWAZ SUNEET ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008